NJ S354 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3841
Note: Carry Over of previous A5445
Note: Carry Over of previous A5445
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-12-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-12-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Updates scope of practice of optometrists.
Title
Updates scope of practice of optometrists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-12-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-12 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2024-12-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3841 (Carry Over) 2023-05-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A5445 (Carry Over) 2023-06-22 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
A920 (Same As) 2024-03-14 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A5445 (Carry Over) 2023-06-22 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
A920 (Same As) 2024-03-14 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading