NJ S3537 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A314
Note: Carry Foward to future S2686
Note: Carry Over of previous A2728
Note: Carry Over of previous S1025
Note: Carry Foward to future S2686
Note: Carry Over of previous A2728
Note: Carry Over of previous S1025
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes military compensation of military personnel serving outside of this State from gross income tax.
Title
Excludes military compensation of military personnel serving outside of this State from gross income tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3537 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3537 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4025 (Same As) 2020-05-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A2728 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S1025 (Carry Over) 2018-02-22 - Combined with S129 (SCS)
S3537 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4025 (Same As) 2020-05-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A2728 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S1025 (Carry Over) 2018-02-22 - Combined with S129 (SCS)
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S3537 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S4000/3537_I1.HTM |