NJ S3516 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-26 - Substituted by A5179 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-26 - Substituted by A5179 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
"Fire Life Safety Damper and Smoke Control System Inspection Verification Act"; Requires routine maintenance and periodic testing of smoke dampers, fire dampers, and smoke control systems in certain buildings by qualified personnel.
Title
"Fire Life Safety Damper and Smoke Control System Inspection Verification Act"; Requires routine maintenance and periodic testing of smoke dampers, fire dampers, and smoke control systems in certain buildings by qualified personnel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-26 | Senate | Substituted by A5179 (1R) |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5179 (Same As) 2023-12-21 - Approved P.L.2023, c.186.