NJ S3512 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S959
Note: Carry Foward to future A3181
Note: Carry Foward to future A3181
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-08 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-08 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes purchaser of automobile by private sale to operate automobile for three-day period following purchase without permanent registration or transfer of title.
Title
Authorizes purchaser of automobile by private sale to operate automobile for three-day period following purchase without permanent registration or transfer of title.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-08 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate Amendment (28-0) (Corrado) |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3512 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S3512 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A5800 (Same As) 2021-06-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S3512 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A5800 (Same As) 2021-06-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee