NJ S3511 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-20 - Substituted by A5096 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-20 - Substituted by A5096 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Replaces statutory terms regarding alcohol and substance use.
Title
Replaces statutory terms regarding alcohol and substance use.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-15 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-20 | Senate | Substituted by A5096 (1R) |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5096 (Same As) 2023-11-20 - Approved P.L.2023, c.177.