NJ S3505 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-15)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Hearing: May 18 @ 10:30 am in Registration Form
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires assignment of unemployment claims handlers to legislative districts during COVID-19 pandemic state of emergency; appropriates $1.8 million.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires assignment of unemployment claims handlers to legislative districts during COVID-19 pandemic state of emergency; appropriates $1.8 million.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-25AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
2021-03-25SenatePassed by the Senate (37-0)
2021-03-22SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2021-03-15SenateTransferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2021-03-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5371 (Same As) 2021-02-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback