NJ S3488 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.402.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.402.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Modifies certain procedures pertaining to school district regionalization; establishes grant program for cost reimbursement of conducting regionalization feasibility studies; and provides financial incentives for regionalization.
Title
Modifies certain procedures pertaining to school district regionalization; establishes grant program for cost reimbursement of conducting regionalization feasibility studies; and provides financial incentives for regionalization.
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] | Sen. John Burzichelli [D] |
Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Steven Oroho [R] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5537 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5537 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.402. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0) |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend. |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2021-12-02 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (36-0) |
2021-11-08 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Substituted for A5537 (2R) |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5537 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Substituted by S3488 (2R)