NJ S3470 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Substituted by A5034
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Substituted by A5034
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes sale and conveyance of certain State-owned real property in Stafford Township, Ocean County to US Fish and Wildlife Service.
Title
Authorizes sale and conveyance of certain State-owned real property in Stafford Township, Ocean County to US Fish and Wildlife Service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Senate | Substituted by A5034 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5034 (Same As) 2019-05-10 - Approved P.L.2019, c.119.