NJ S3459 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts law enforcement officers and certain private property towing companies from certain provisions of "Predatory Towing Prevention Act."
Title
Exempts law enforcement officers and certain private property towing companies from certain provisions of "Predatory Towing Prevention Act."
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] | Sen. Robert Gordon [D] | Sen. John Burzichelli [D] | Rep. Annette Quijano [D] |
Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A5329 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-14 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-14 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-0-0) |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Substituted for A5329 |
2017-12-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2017-12-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-14 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5329 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S3459