NJ S3434 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-10)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Approved P.L.2021, c.109.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-10)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Approved P.L.2021, c.109.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires boards of education to provide special education and related services to certain students exceeding age of eligibility for special education and related services.
Title
Requires boards of education to provide special education and related services to certain students exceeding age of eligibility for special education and related services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5366 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5366 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.109. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Substituted for A5366 (2R) |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-1) |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5366 (Same As) 2021-05-20 - Substituted by S3434 (2R)