NJ S3426 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A1578
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-27 - Substituted by A4132 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-27 - Substituted by A4132 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes NJ Agricultural Literacy Week.
Title
Establishes NJ Agricultural Literacy Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-27 | Senate | Substituted by A4132 (2R) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4132 (Same As) 2023-05-08 - Approved P.L.2023, c.51.
A1578 (Carry Over) 2021-06-14 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A1578 (Carry Over) 2021-06-14 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading