NJ S3418 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A5294 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides fast track hiring and advancement employment opportunities by State for persons with significant disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides fast track hiring and advancement employment opportunities by State for persons with significant disabilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-06 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-10SenateSubstituted by A5294 (1R)
2021-12-20SenateSenate Amendment (26-0) (Gopal)
2021-12-06SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2021-02-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5294 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.465.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback