NJ S3414 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Substituted by A5002 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Permits certain planned real estate developments to file certain liens; concerns limited priority of certain liens.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits certain planned real estate developments to file certain liens; concerns limited priority of certain liens.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25SenateSubstituted by A5002 (1R)
2019-02-21SenateSenate Amendment (28-0) (Singleton)
2019-02-07SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-01-31SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5002 (Same As) 2019-04-29 - Approved P.L.2019, c.68.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback