NJ S3401 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future A1970
Note: Carry Foward to future S1298

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-19 - Senate Amendment (23-0) (Gopal)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes criminal offenses and civil penalties concerning inhumane confinement of breeding pigs and calves raised for veal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes criminal offenses and civil penalties concerning inhumane confinement of breeding pigs and calves raised for veal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-19SenateSenate Amendment (23-0) (Gopal)
2021-02-16SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2021-02-04SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3401 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Senate Amendment (23-0) (Gopal)
S3401 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Senate Amendment (23-0) (Gopal)
A5236 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback