NJ S3373 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Senate Amendment (33-0) (Cruz-Perez)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes maternity care standards for general hospitals providing maternity care.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes maternity care standards for general hospitals providing maternity care.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25SenateSenate Amendment (33-0) (Cruz-Perez)
2019-02-07SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4930 (Same As) 2019-05-13 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback