NJ S3365 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Approved P.L.2019, c.86.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes perinatal episode of care pilot program in Medicaid.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes perinatal episode of care pilot program in Medicaid.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4932 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.86.
2019-03-25SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0)
2019-03-25SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-03-25AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (80-0-0)
2019-03-25AssemblySubstituted for A4932 (1R)
2019-03-25AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Mosquera)
2019-03-25AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2019-03-25SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2019-03-04SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4932 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S3365 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback