NJ S3361 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Substituted by A5207 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits State and local entities and private detention facilities from entering into agreement to detain noncitizens.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits State and local entities and private detention facilities from entering into agreement to detain noncitizens.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-24SenateSubstituted by A5207 (1R)
2021-06-21SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2021-05-20SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2021-05-20SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5207 (Same As) 2021-08-20 - Approved P.L.2021, c.199.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback