NJ S3360 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A1708
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-05 - Substituted by A2439 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-05 - Substituted by A2439 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOT Commissioner to develop public awareness programs and use variable message signs to inform motorists about State's "move over" law.
Title
Requires DOT Commissioner to develop public awareness programs and use variable message signs to inform motorists about State's "move over" law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-14 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-05 | Senate | Substituted by A2439 (1R) |
2017-12-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2439 (Same As) 2018-01-05 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-0)
A1708 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A1708 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee