NJ S3354 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 31-11-1)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.148.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates $8,992,898 to DEP from constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues and various Green Acres funds for grants to certain nonprofit entities to acquire or develop lands for recreation and conservation purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates $8,992,898 to DEP from constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues and various Green Acres funds for grants to certain nonprofit entities to acquire or develop lands for recreation and conservation purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A5044 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-21AssemblyApproved P.L.2017, c.148.
2017-06-29AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (78-0-0)
2017-06-29AssemblySubstituted for A5044
2017-06-22AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2017-06-22SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2017-06-19SenateIntroduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading

Same As/Similar To

A5044 (Same As) 2017-06-29 - Substituted by S3354

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback