NJ S3353 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-12)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.147.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates $12.3 million from constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues for recreation and conservation purposes to DEP for State capital and park development projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates $12.3 million from constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues for recreation and conservation purposes to DEP for State capital and park development projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A5046 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-21AssemblyApproved P.L.2017, c.147.
2017-06-29AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0)
2017-06-29AssemblySubstituted for A5046
2017-06-22AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2017-06-22SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2017-06-19SenateIntroduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading

Same As/Similar To

A5046 (Same As) 2017-06-29 - Substituted by S3353

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback