NJ S3344 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3120
Note: Carry Foward to future S2287
Note: Carry Foward to future S2287
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-19 - Substituted by A4790 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-19 - Substituted by A4790 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes NJ Non-Profit Loan Guarantee Pilot Program within EDA.
Title
Establishes NJ Non-Profit Loan Guarantee Pilot Program within EDA.
Sponsors
Sen. Nicholas Scutari [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Sen. Shirley Turner [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-12-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-19 | Senate | Substituted by A4790 (1R) |
2022-12-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3344 (Carry Over) 2022-12-19 - Substituted by A4790 (1R)
S3344 (Carry Over) 2022-12-19 - Substituted by A4790 (1R)
A4790 (Same As) 2023-02-06 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
S3344 (Carry Over) 2022-12-19 - Substituted by A4790 (1R)
A4790 (Same As) 2023-02-06 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly