NJ S3342 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1191
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.400.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.400.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs NJT to erect statue in honor of A. Philip Randolph, appropriates $90,000.
Title
Directs NJT to erect statue in honor of A. Philip Randolph, appropriates $90,000.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Codey [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] |
Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] | Sen. Ronald Rice [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] |
Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5463 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-03 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5463 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-03 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.400. |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0) |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Substituted for A5463 |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-06 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2021-11-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3342 (Carry Over) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.400.
A5463 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S3342
A5463 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S3342