NJ S3341 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (67-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (67-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends document submission deadline under Economic Redevelopment and Growth Grant Program, Grow New Jersey Assistance Program, and Urban Transit Hub Tax Credit Program.*
Title
Extends document submission deadline under Economic Redevelopment and Growth Grant Program, Grow New Jersey Assistance Program, and Urban Transit Hub Tax Credit Program.*
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Rep. Eliana Marin [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] |
Rep. John Wisniewski [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A5050 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (67-1-0) |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Substituted for A5050 (1R) |
2017-12-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Emergency Resolution (35-0) (Ruiz) |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment (27-0) (Ruiz) |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5050 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S3341 (1R)