NJ S3330 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes pilot program in DCF to study impact of child care services provided by community providers operating in public school facilities; requires community providers to meet certain criteria. *

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes pilot program in DCF to study impact of child care services provided by community providers operating in public school facilities; requires community providers to meet certain criteria. *

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-03-18AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
2019-03-14SenatePassed by the Senate (24-8)
2019-02-21SenateSenate Amendment (25-0) (Addiego)
2019-02-07SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-02-07SenateTransferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2019-01-15SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4864 (Same As) 2019-01-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
A5066 (Same As) 2019-05-16 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback