NJ S3327 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.321.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.321.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Commission on Latino and Hispanic Heritage in DOE.
Title
Establishes Commission on Latino and Hispanic Heritage in DOE.
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] | Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] | Sen. Britnee Timberlake [D] |
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Rep. Angelica Jimenez [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4995 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.321. |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0) |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Substituted for A4995 |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-0) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4995 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S3327