NJ S3323 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes FY 2021 supplemental appropriation of $180 million to DCF, DHS and DOH for increased rates for social service and early intervention providers in financial distress due to coronavirus disease 2019 public health crisis.
Title
Makes FY 2021 supplemental appropriation of $180 million to DCF, DHS and DOH for increased rates for social service and early intervention providers in financial distress due to coronavirus disease 2019 public health crisis.
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Anthony M. Bucco [R] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Sen. Brian Stack [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5268 (Same As) 2021-01-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee