NJ S3313 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-30 - Substituted by A4836 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes task force to evaluate quality, efficacy, costs, and educational outcomes of online courses offered by public and independent institutions of higher education and degree-granting proprietary institutions during COVID-19 pandemic.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes task force to evaluate quality, efficacy, costs, and educational outcomes of online courses offered by public and independent institutions of higher education and degree-granting proprietary institutions during COVID-19 pandemic.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30SenateSubstituted by A4836 (2R)
2021-06-30SenateSenate Amendment (36-0) (Pou)
2021-03-11SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2021-01-07SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4836 (Same As) 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.299.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback