NJ S3305 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S242
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires BPU to allow low- and moderate-income residential customers to self-attest to income for participation in community solar programs.
Title
Requires BPU to allow low- and moderate-income residential customers to self-attest to income for participation in community solar programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-15 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2022-12-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-11-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3305 (Carry Over) 2022-12-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4953 (Same As) 2022-12-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
A5387 (Same As) 2023-05-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
A4953 (Same As) 2022-12-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
A5387 (Same As) 2023-05-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee