NJ S3285 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1111
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A2360
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A2360
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires electric public utility to charge residential rate for service used by residential customer for electric vehicle charging at charging stations within certain designated parking spaces.
Title
Requires electric public utility to charge residential rate for service used by residential customer for electric vehicle charging at charging stations within certain designated parking spaces.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Substituted by A2360 |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment (24-0) (Greenstein) |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-12-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3285 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A2360
A2360 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.441.
A2360 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.441.