NJ S3282 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on January 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.258.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on January 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.258.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands Police Training Commission membership to include representative from National Organization of Black Law Enforcement Executives.*
Title
Expands Police Training Commission membership to include representative from National Organization of Black Law Enforcement Executives.*
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Rice [D] | Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Charles Mainor [D] |
Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Peter Barnes [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 54 N: 8 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4850 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 22 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-14 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4850 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 22 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-14 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Senate | Approved P.L.2015, c.258. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (54-8-3) |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend. |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Emergency Resolution (35-0) (Rice) |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received, 2nd Reading on Concur with Gov. (34-0) |
2015-12-17 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (44-22-2) |
2015-12-17 | Assembly | Substituted for A4850 |
2015-12-17 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2015-12-17 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2015-12-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-12-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4850 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Substituted by S3282