NJ S3281 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-07-04 - Substituted by A4969 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes Montclair State University as public research university.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes Montclair State University as public research university.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-26 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-04SenateSubstituted by A4969 (1R)
2017-06-26SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2017-06-26SenateTransferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2017-06-01SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4969 (Same As) 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.178.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback