NJ S3277 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Substituted by A4745 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Raises from 45 to 57 maximum eligibility age for exempt fireman certificates and membership in New Jersey State Fireman's Association.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Raises from 45 to 57 maximum eligibility age for exempt fireman certificates and membership in New Jersey State Fireman's Association.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-03SenateSubstituted by A4745 (1R)
2021-05-20SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-12-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4745 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Approved P.L.2021, c.123.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback