NJ S3275 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-24 - Approved P.L.2023, c.170.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-24 - Approved P.L.2023, c.170.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires establishment of new State website with information on rights related to, and health benefits coverage for, reproductive health care services.
Title
Requires establishment of new State website with information on rights related to, and health benefits coverage for, reproductive health care services.
Sponsors
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Nicholas Scutari [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 23 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 42 N: 31 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4829 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 23 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 42 N: 31 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4829 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-24 | Senate | Approved P.L.2023, c.170. |
2023-06-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (23-11) |
2023-06-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2023-06-30 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (48-23-1) |
2023-06-30 | Assembly | Motion To Table Aa (42-31-0) (Greenwald) |
2023-06-30 | Assembly | Motion To Aa (Webber) |
2023-06-30 | Assembly | Substituted for A4829 (2R) |
2023-06-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-06-22 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (23-12) |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-10-31 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4829 (Same As) 2023-06-30 - Substituted by S3275 (2R)