NJ S3272 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A2674

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 10 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes "Blue Alert System."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes "Blue Alert System."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-12-10SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2604 (Same As) 2019-02-25 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
A2674 (Carry Over) 2016-06-06 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback