NJ S3246 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes elective pass-through business alternative income tax and allows refundable gross income tax credit for taxpayers earning income from pass-through businesses in taxable year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes elective pass-through business alternative income tax and allows refundable gross income tax credit for taxpayers earning income from pass-through businesses in taxable year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-01-15AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-12-17SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2018-12-10SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-12-03SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4807 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback