NJ S3242 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.144.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.144.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies procedures for approval of environmental and transportation infrastructure projects.
Title
Clarifies procedures for approval of environmental and transportation infrastructure projects.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Gordon [D] | Sen. Steven Oroho [R] | Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Vincent Prieto [D] |
Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] | Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4997 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2017, c.144. |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-1) |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Substituted for A4997 |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4997 (Same As) 2017-06-29 - Substituted by S3242