NJ S3240 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-10-1)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.142.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes NJ Environmental Infrastructure Trust to expend certain sums to make loans for environmental infrastructure projects for FY2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes NJ Environmental Infrastructure Trust to expend certain sums to make loans for environmental infrastructure projects for FY2018.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4996 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-21AssemblyApproved P.L.2017, c.142.
2017-06-29AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-1)
2017-06-29AssemblySubstituted for A4996
2017-06-22AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2017-06-19SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2017-06-01SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2017-05-25SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4996 (Same As) 2017-06-29 - Substituted by S3240 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback