NJ S3238 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 26 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Substituted by A4701 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires DHS to establish electronic portal to promote surplus food donation collaboration among nonprofit organizations, gleaners, and food retailers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires DHS to establish electronic portal to promote surplus food donation collaboration among nonprofit organizations, gleaners, and food retailers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-31SenateSubstituted by A4701 (1R)
2019-01-17SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-11-26SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4701 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Approved P.L.2019, c.54.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback