NJ S3235 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-11 - Substituted by A5113
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates $11,777,499 from constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues to NJ Historic Trust for grants for certain historic preservation projects and associated administrative expenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates $11,777,499 from constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues to NJ Historic Trust for grants for certain historic preservation projects and associated administrative expenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-11SenateSubstituted by A5113
2020-12-14SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-12-07SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5113 (Same As) 2021-02-04 - Approved P.L.2021, c.12.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback