NJ S3230 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-8)
Status: Passed on February 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - Approved P.L.2021, c.8.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates $30.387 million from constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues to DEP for State acquisition of lands for recreation and conservation purposes, including Blue Acres projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates $30.387 million from constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues to DEP for State acquisition of lands for recreation and conservation purposes, including Blue Acres projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5115 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-10 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-04AssemblyApproved P.L.2021, c.8.
2021-01-11AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0)
2021-01-11AssemblySubstituted for A5115
2021-01-11AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2021-01-11SenatePassed by the Senate (34-0)
2020-12-10SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-12-07SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5115 (Same As) 2021-01-11 - Substituted by S3230

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback