NJ S3229 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-11 - Substituted by A5114
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-11 - Substituted by A5114
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates $37.16 million from constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues for recreation and conservation purposes to DEP for State capital and park development projects.
Title
Appropriates $37.16 million from constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues for recreation and conservation purposes to DEP for State capital and park development projects.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Codey [D] | Sen. Kristin Corrado [R] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Sen. Shirley Turner [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-10 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-11 | Senate | Substituted by A5114 |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5114 (Same As) 2021-02-04 - Approved P.L.2021, c.13.