NJ S3226 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1079
Note: Carry Foward to future A2419
Note: Carry Foward to future A2419
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-26 - Substituted by A4870
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-26 - Substituted by A4870
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"Safe Transportation Jobs and Fair Employment Rules Act."
Title
"Safe Transportation Jobs and Fair Employment Rules Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-26 | Senate | Substituted by A4870 |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3226 (Carry Over) 2017-06-26 - Substituted by A4870
S3226 (Carry Over) 2017-06-26 - Substituted by A4870
A4870 (Same As) 2017-07-31 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
S3226 (Carry Over) 2017-06-26 - Substituted by A4870
A4870 (Same As) 2017-07-31 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly