NJ S3195 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on October 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-27 - Substituted by A4748
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-27 - Substituted by A4748
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enhances customer service experience with Business Action Center in Department of State by collecting and disseminating customer assistance metrics.
Title
Enhances customer service experience with Business Action Center in Department of State by collecting and disseminating customer assistance metrics.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-27 | Senate | Substituted by A4748 |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-10-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4748 (Same As) 2023-03-20 - Approved P.L.2023, c.26.