NJ S3191 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A1383
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-19 - Substituted by A2722 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-19 - Substituted by A2722 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits veteran to receive credit toward licensure as licensed practical nurse upon completing certain military medical training programs.
Title
Permits veteran to receive credit toward licensure as licensed practical nurse upon completing certain military medical training programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Bramnick [R] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Edward Durr [R] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] |
Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-11-07 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-19 | Senate | Substituted by A2722 (2R) |
2022-11-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-10-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2722 (Same As) 2023-03-10 - Approved P.L.2023, c.18.
A1383 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A1383 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee