NJ S3186 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-6)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends list of environmental infrastructure projects approved for long-term funding for FY2019 to include new projects and remove certain projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends list of environmental infrastructure projects approved for long-term funding for FY2019 to include new projects and remove certain projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4749 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-26 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-31AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.12.
2018-12-17AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0)
2018-12-17AssemblySubstituted for A4749 (1R)
2018-12-17AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-12-17SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2018-11-26SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-10-29SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4749 (Same As) 2018-12-17 - Substituted by S3186 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback