NJ S3181 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.139.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Permits solar electric power generation facility projects not having commenced commercial operation to retain designation through May 31, 2018 as connected to distribution system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits solar electric power generation facility projects not having commenced commercial operation to retain designation through May 31, 2018 as connected to distribution system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4756 Aaa (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-21SenateApproved P.L.2017, c.139.
2017-06-29SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (25-0)
2017-06-29SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2017-06-29AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (77-0-0)
2017-06-29AssemblySubstituted for A4756 (2R)
2017-06-29AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (DeAngelo)
2017-06-22AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2017-06-22SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2017-06-01SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2017-05-15SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4756 (Same As) 2017-06-29 - Substituted by S3181 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback