NJ S3180 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 26 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-12-17 - Substituted by A4733
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates $15,000,000 from constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues to State Agriculture Development Committee for municipal planning incentive grants for farmland preservation purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates $15,000,000 from constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues to State Agriculture Development Committee for municipal planning incentive grants for farmland preservation purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-17SenateSubstituted by A4733
2018-12-06SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-11-26SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4733 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.27.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback