NJ S3173 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future A462
Note: Carry Foward to future S1505

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-12-20 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Permits operation of pedicabs and alcoholic beverage consumption by passengers of pedicabs in certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits operation of pedicabs and alcoholic beverage consumption by passengers of pedicabs in certain circumstances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-20AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2021-12-13AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2021-06-09AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
2021-06-03SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2021-03-11SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-11-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3173 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
S3173 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
A6160 (Same As) 2021-12-20 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback