NJ S3158 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on November 26 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A4814/4520 (ACS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Makes transient accommodation taxes and fees only applicable if rented through marketplace or travel agency.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes transient accommodation taxes and fees only applicable if rented through marketplace or travel agency.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateSubstituted by A4814/4520 (ACS/1R)
2019-06-17SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-05-13SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2019-05-13SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2018-11-26SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4814 (Same As) 2019-08-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.235.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback