NJ S3151 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on October 29 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Substituted by A4734
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates $1,190,349 from constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues to NJ Historic Trust for historic site management grants to certain historic preservation projects and associated administrative expenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates $1,190,349 from constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues to NJ Historic Trust for historic site management grants to certain historic preservation projects and associated administrative expenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-31SenateSubstituted by A4734
2018-12-17SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-10-29SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4734 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Approved P.L.2019, c.55.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback